THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
16-054 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 864 5646
Fax: 416 864 5207

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Teshima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Teshima (CPSO#: 79477 )
Business Address: St. Michaels Hospital
16-054 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5646

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
16-054 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 864 5646
Fax: 416 864 5207

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Teshima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Teshima (CPSO#: 79477 )
Business Address: St. Michaels Hospital
16-054 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5646

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WAYNE TESHIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESHIMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WAYNE TESHIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESHIMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003