THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:19:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 968-9840
Fax: (613) 968-5495
Address: 145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario
K8N2S9
Belleville Ontario K8N 2S9
Phone: 613 771 3404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Knarr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Knarr (CPSO#: 79496 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 968-9840
Fax: (613) 968-5495
Address: 145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario
K8N2S9
Belleville Ontario K8N 2S9
Phone: 613 771 3404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Knarr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Knarr (CPSO#: 79496 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA KRISTINE KNARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNARR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA KRISTINE KNARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNARR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003