THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:18:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-16 Green St
Nepean ON K2J 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-825-8397
Fax: 613-825-9687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boparai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boparai (CPSO#: 79507 )
Business Address: 16 Green St
Nepean ON K2J 3R2
6138258397
Business Address: 300 - 100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
(613) 564-3950

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-16 Green St
Nepean ON K2J 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-825-8397
Fax: 613-825-9687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boparai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boparai (CPSO#: 79507 )
Business Address: 16 Green St
Nepean ON K2J 3R2
6138258397
Business Address: 300 - 100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
(613) 564-3950

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHABAB BOPARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOPARAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHABAB BOPARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOPARAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003