THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:42:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KACHCHI, SPANISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4619 Burgoyne Street
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 833 440 0202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hafeez Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jamal (CPSO#: 79508 )
Business Address: 4617-4619 Burgoyne Street
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1G3
(833) 440-0202

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KACHCHI, SPANISH, URDU
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4619 Burgoyne Street
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 833 440 0202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hafeez Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jamal (CPSO#: 79508 )
Business Address: 4617-4619 Burgoyne Street
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1G3
(833) 440-0202

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAFEEZ LIAQUATALI JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAFEEZ LIAQUATALI JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003