THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
C2220-1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-761-5383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 21 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam J. Sachs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sachs (CPSO#: 79509 )
Business Address: 951 Hare Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3J6
613-794-6835

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam J. Sachs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
C2220-1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-761-5383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 21 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam J. Sachs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sachs (CPSO#: 79509 )
Business Address: 951 Hare Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3J6
613-794-6835

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam J. Sachs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM JOSHUA SACHS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM JOSHUA SACHS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003