THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:55:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Childrens Hospital of Western On
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8266
Fax: (519) 685-8156

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roberta Berard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Berard (CPSO#: 79511 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8266

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Childrens Hospital of Western On
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8266
Fax: (519) 685-8156

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roberta Berard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Berard (CPSO#: 79511 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8266

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERTA AUDREY BERARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERTA AUDREY BERARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003