THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-79 Colborne St E
Orillia ON L3V 1T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-734-3943
Fax: 705-734-0007
Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
Divisions of Clinical Immunology &
Allergy and Rheumatology
Room 3V51 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76401
Fax: (905) 521-4971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 03 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.A. Haaland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-79 Colborne St E
Orillia ON L3V 1T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-734-3943
Fax: 705-734-0007
Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
Divisions of Clinical Immunology &
Allergy and Rheumatology
Room 3V51 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76401
Fax: (905) 521-4971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 03 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.A. Haaland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK ALLAN HAALAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAALAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK ALLAN HAALAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAALAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003