THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 16:34:48 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bruyere Continuing Care
Geriatric Rehabilitation
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1717 Saint Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1G 3V4
Phone: 613-523-5550
Fax: 613-523-5580

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rene Leiva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Leiva (CPSO#: 79532 )
Business Address: Bruyere Continuing Care
Geriatric Rehabilitation
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 562-6262 Extn: 4066

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bruyere Continuing Care
Geriatric Rehabilitation
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1717 Saint Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1G 3V4
Phone: 613-523-5550
Fax: 613-523-5580

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rene Leiva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Leiva (CPSO#: 79532 )
Business Address: Bruyere Continuing Care
Geriatric Rehabilitation
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 562-6262 Extn: 4066

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENE ANTONIO LEIVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENE ANTONIO LEIVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003