THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Skin Surgery Centre
5th floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163237732
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto General Hospital
Ambulatory Transplant Centre
Peter Munk Building, 12th floor
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 4113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: An-Wen Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan (CPSO#: 79536 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
(416) 323-7732

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Skin Surgery Centre
5th floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163237732
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto General Hospital
Ambulatory Transplant Centre
Peter Munk Building, 12th floor
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 4113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: An-Wen Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan (CPSO#: 79536 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
(416) 323-7732

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AN-WEN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AN-WEN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003