THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:47:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 405
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 640-0892
Fax: (416) 640-1243

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paula N. Fishman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fishman (CPSO#: 79573 )
Business Address: 405 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 640-0892

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 405
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 640-0892
Fax: (416) 640-1243

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paula N. Fishman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fishman (CPSO#: 79573 )
Business Address: 405 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 640-0892

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA NATALIE FISHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA NATALIE FISHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003