THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:55:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-4785
Address: Forrest Hill Nursing Home
6501 Campeau Dr
Kanata Ontario K2K 3E9
Phone: (613) 599-1991
Extension: 13
Fax: (613) 599-9096

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laith Bustani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bustani (CPSO#: 79583 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 6501 Campeau Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2K 3E9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-4785
Address: Forrest Hill Nursing Home
6501 Campeau Dr
Kanata Ontario K2K 3E9
Phone: (613) 599-1991
Extension: 13
Fax: (613) 599-9096

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laith Bustani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bustani (CPSO#: 79583 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 6501 Campeau Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2K 3E9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAITH AASIM BUSTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSTANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAITH AASIM BUSTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSTANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003