THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:35:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Fax: (613) 548-6042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Scott (CPSO#: 79597 )
Business Address: 835 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1G7
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
X Ray Department
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400
Business Address: KMRI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
(613) 384-1220
Business Address: 752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario M5V 1N3
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2301
Business Address: 80 Beverley St
Kingston ON K7L 3Y6
6135460887

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Fax: (613) 548-6042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Scott (CPSO#: 79597 )
Business Address: 835 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1G7
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
X Ray Department
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400
Business Address: KMRI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
(613) 384-1220
Business Address: 752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario M5V 1N3
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2301
Business Address: 80 Beverley St
Kingston ON K7L 3Y6
6135460887

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES FREMONT SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES FREMONT SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003