THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:01:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217 Terrace Hill St.
Unit 106
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 304-8400
Fax: 519-304-8402
Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St.
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 15 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. R. Parbhakar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Parbhakar (CPSO#: 79624 )
Business Address: 217 Terrace Hill Street
Suite 106
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
(519) 304-8400
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217 Terrace Hill St.
Unit 106
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 304-8400
Fax: 519-304-8402
Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St.
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 15 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. R. Parbhakar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Parbhakar (CPSO#: 79624 )
Business Address: 217 Terrace Hill Street
Suite 106
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
(519) 304-8400
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR RAJAN PARBHAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARBHAKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR RAJAN PARBHAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARBHAKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003