THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:22:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queens University
Dept of Pathology and Molecular Med
Richardson Laboratory Room 201d
88 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-2823
Fax: (613) 533-2907

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David J. Good Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Good (CPSO#: 79628 )
Business Address: Queens University
Department of Pathology and Molecular Medicine
Richardson Lab - Room 201c
88 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-2823

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queens University
Dept of Pathology and Molecular Med
Richardson Laboratory Room 201d
88 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-2823
Fax: (613) 533-2907

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David J. Good Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Good (CPSO#: 79628 )
Business Address: Queens University
Department of Pathology and Molecular Medicine
Richardson Lab - Room 201c
88 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-2823

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES GOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES GOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003