THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:20:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Green Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Xenoyannis (CPSO#: 80825 ) Dr. K. Green (CPSO#: 79629 )
Business Address: 104 - 333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0B8
(519) 290-2460
Business Address: Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
(519) 537-5951

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Green Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Xenoyannis (CPSO#: 80825 ) Dr. K. Green (CPSO#: 79629 )
Business Address: 104 - 333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0B8
(519) 290-2460
Business Address: Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
(519) 537-5951

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTY-JILL RENEE GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTY-JILL RENEE GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003