THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:02:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 88333
Fax: (613) 738-8261
Address: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Liu (CPSO#: 79640 )
Business Address: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 738-1584
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 738-8400
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 738-8400
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 88333
Fax: (613) 738-8261
Address: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Liu (CPSO#: 79640 )
Business Address: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 738-1584
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 738-8400
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 738-8400
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DORA MARISA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DORA MARISA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003