THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:19:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital - Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road, Box 911
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 70185
Fax: (613) 247-3511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Goodwin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goodwin (CPSO#: 79663 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Regional
Cancer Centre
911 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 5L3
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 70185

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital - Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road, Box 911
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 70185
Fax: (613) 247-3511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Goodwin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goodwin (CPSO#: 79663 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Regional
Cancer Centre
911 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 5L3
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 70185

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL ANNE GOODWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODWIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL ANNE GOODWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODWIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003