THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 01:38:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-679 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058531212
Fax: 9058531214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne M. Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fortier (CPSO#: 79665 )
Business Address: Suite 39
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8X2
(905) 853-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-679 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058531212
Fax: 9058531214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne M. Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fortier (CPSO#: 79665 )
Business Address: Suite 39
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8X2
(905) 853-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MICHELLE FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MICHELLE FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003