THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:16:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade do Estado do Rio de Janeiro (UERJ) Faculdade de Ciências Médicas, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Hsc 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudia Lace de Almeida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lace de Almeida (CPSO#: 79675 )
Business Address: HHS McMaster University Medical Centre
HSC 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75207

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade do Estado do Rio de Janeiro (UERJ) Faculdade de Ciências Médicas, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Hsc 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudia Lace de Almeida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lace de Almeida (CPSO#: 79675 )
Business Address: HHS McMaster University Medical Centre
HSC 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75207

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Oct 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 27 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CLAUDIA LACE DE ALMEIDA may practise medicine independently in pediatrics and pediatric cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CLAUDIA LACE DE ALMEIDA may practise medicine independently in pediatrics and pediatric cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade do Estado do Rio de Janeiro (UERJ) Faculdade de Ciências Médicas, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Oct 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003