THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Capital University of Medical Sciences, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 345
600 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 4T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 915-9411
Fax: (519) 915-8992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Xue (CPSO#: 79679 )
Business Address: 345-600 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 4X9
(519) 915-9411

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Capital University of Medical Sciences, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 345
600 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 4T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 915-9411
Fax: (519) 915-8992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Xue (CPSO#: 79679 )
Business Address: 345-600 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 4X9
(519) 915-9411

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHUWEN XUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHUWEN XUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Capital University of Medical Sciences, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003