THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1448 lawerence ave street east
suite #214
North York Ontario M4A2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 344 5990
Fax: 647 343 6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jul 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Aldabbagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Dabbagh (CPSO#: 79683 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1448 lawerence ave street east
suite #214
North York Ontario M4A2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 344 5990
Fax: 647 343 6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jul 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Aldabbagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Dabbagh (CPSO#: 79683 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUROOG MAHMOOD NEKI AL-DABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-DABBAGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUROOG MAHMOOD NEKI AL-DABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-DABBAGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003