THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:05:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Sylvan St
LWDH
General Surgery
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Extension: 5020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 16 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hristo Hristov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hristov (CPSO#: 79692 )
Business Address: Kenora Medical Centre
4 - 45 Wolsley Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-5410
Business Address: 21 Sylvan Street
LWDH
General Surgery
Kenora Ontario P0V
8074689861 Extn: 5020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN
Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Sylvan St
LWDH
General Surgery
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Extension: 5020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 16 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hristo Hristov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hristov (CPSO#: 79692 )
Business Address: Kenora Medical Centre
4 - 45 Wolsley Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-5410
Business Address: 21 Sylvan Street
LWDH
General Surgery
Kenora Ontario P0V
8074689861 Extn: 5020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HRISTO NIKOLOV HRISTOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HRISTOV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HRISTO NIKOLOV HRISTOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HRISTOV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003