THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:06:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KONKANI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Creditview Medical
B-14
1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5V 1N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 567-4622
Fax: (905) 567-7545

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pinto (CPSO#: 79694 )
Business Address: Creditview Medical
B-14
1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5V 1N3
(905) 567-4622

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KONKANI
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Creditview Medical
B-14
1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5V 1N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 567-4622
Fax: (905) 567-7545

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pinto (CPSO#: 79694 )
Business Address: Creditview Medical
B-14
1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5V 1N3
(905) 567-4622

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOYCE FLORY PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOYCE FLORY PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003