THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:02:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: West Azerbaijan Univ. of Med. Sc.&Health, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
Dept of Laboratory Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Extension: 2454
Fax: (519) 837-6461

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 13 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Navid Liaghati Nasseri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Liaghati Nasseri (CPSO#: 79709 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Lab Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 837-6440 Extn: 2454

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: West Azerbaijan Univ. of Med. Sc.&Health, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
Dept of Laboratory Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Extension: 2454
Fax: (519) 837-6461

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 13 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Navid Liaghati Nasseri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Liaghati Nasseri (CPSO#: 79709 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Lab Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 837-6440 Extn: 2454

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVID LIAGHATI NASSERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAGHATI NASSERI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVID LIAGHATI NASSERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAGHATI NASSERI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: West Azerbaijan Univ. of Med. Sc.&Health, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003