THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Asyut University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Postmaster Medical Clinic
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville Ontario L6M 0N2
Phone: (905) 844-1700
Fax: (905) 844-1705

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MASSOUD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Massoud (CPSO#: 79711 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
905-845-2571
Business Address: 2540 Postmaster Drive
Postmaster Medical Clinic
Oakville Ontario L6M 0N2
905-844-1700

Corporation Name: Massoud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Mar 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Asyut University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Postmaster Medical Clinic
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville Ontario L6M 0N2
Phone: (905) 844-1700
Fax: (905) 844-1705

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MASSOUD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Massoud (CPSO#: 79711 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
905-845-2571
Business Address: 2540 Postmaster Drive
Postmaster Medical Clinic
Oakville Ontario L6M 0N2
905-844-1700

Corporation Name: Massoud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Mar 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARID HANNA MASSOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSOUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARID HANNA MASSOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSOUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Asyut University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003