THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:25:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge Health Center
Second Floor
Uxbridge ON L9P 1R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-852-1009
Fax: 905-852-3531

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Nov 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlye Jensen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Jensen (CPSO#: 79721 )
Business Address: Suite B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 0B1
(905) 852-1009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge Health Center
Second Floor
Uxbridge ON L9P 1R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-852-1009
Fax: 905-852-3531

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Nov 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlye Jensen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Jensen (CPSO#: 79721 )
Business Address: Suite B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 0B1
(905) 852-1009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLYE ANN JENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLYE ANN JENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003