THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary site
Department of Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 7442
Fax: (416) 281-7384
Address: Suite 1106
4789 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2N 0G3
Phone: 416-792-1022
Fax: 888-612-7157

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. U. Syed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Syed (CPSO#: 79732 )
Business Address: 1106-4789 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 0G3
(416) 792-1022
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-8131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary site
Department of Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 7442
Fax: (416) 281-7384
Address: Suite 1106
4789 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2N 0G3
Phone: 416-792-1022
Fax: 888-612-7157

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. U. Syed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Syed (CPSO#: 79732 )
Business Address: 1106-4789 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 0G3
(416) 792-1022
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-8131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UZMA SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UZMA SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003