THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:43:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Makan Mokhtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mokhtari (CPSO#: 79743 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3500
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 747-3500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Makan Mokhtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mokhtari (CPSO#: 79743 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3500
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 747-3500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAKAN MOKHTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOKHTARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAKAN MOKHTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOKHTARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003