THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:03:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 2827
Fax: (905) 721-4741
Address: 1000 depalma drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A5W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 15 Nov 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rama Koneru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Koneru (CPSO#: 79748 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 2827
Fax: (905) 721-4741
Address: 1000 depalma drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A5W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 15 Nov 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rama Koneru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Koneru (CPSO#: 79748 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMA DEVI KONERU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONERU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMA DEVI KONERU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONERU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003