THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:30:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Rosemount Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 1P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-688-1177
Fax: 613-688-1991

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charapov and Charapova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Charapova (CPSO#: 79756 ) Dr. I. Charapov (CPSO#: 79599 )
Business Address: 60 Cambridge St N
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
Room B307
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 788-5795
Business Address: Sommerset West CHC
55 Eccles Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 6S3
(613) 298-0479
Business Address: 370-441 Maclaren St
Sedation Dental Group
Ottawa ON K2P 2H3
6138515795
Business Address: 20-1620 Scott St
Holland Cross Dental Center
Dr. Mark McCullough, DDS
Ottawa ON K1Y 4S7
6138515795

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Rosemount Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 1P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-688-1177
Fax: 613-688-1991

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charapov and Charapova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Charapova (CPSO#: 79756 ) Dr. I. Charapov (CPSO#: 79599 )
Business Address: 60 Cambridge St N
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
Room B307
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 788-5795
Business Address: Sommerset West CHC
55 Eccles Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 6S3
(613) 298-0479
Business Address: 370-441 Maclaren St
Sedation Dental Group
Ottawa ON K2P 2H3
6138515795
Business Address: 20-1620 Scott St
Holland Cross Dental Center
Dr. Mark McCullough, DDS
Ottawa ON K1Y 4S7
6138515795

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELENA GRIGORIEVNA CHARAPOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARAPOVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELENA GRIGORIEVNA CHARAPOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARAPOVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003