THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 02:02:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough, ON
K9J7C6
Dialysis Unit
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-5147
Fax: (705) 876-5178

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Butan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Butan (CPSO#: 79759 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 876-5078
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: 1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 377-7735
Business Address: 815 High Street East
Peterborough Ontario K9J 8J9
(705) 876-8737

Corporation Name: Beaubien Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough, ON
K9J7C6
Dialysis Unit
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-5147
Fax: (705) 876-5178

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Butan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Butan (CPSO#: 79759 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 876-5078
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: 1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 377-7735
Business Address: 815 High Street East
Peterborough Ontario K9J 8J9
(705) 876-8737

Corporation Name: Beaubien Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RADU BUTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RADU BUTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003