THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 498-0368
Fax: (613) 498-3961

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Mussett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mussett (CPSO#: 79786 )
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 498-0368

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 498-0368
Fax: (613) 498-3961

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Mussett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mussett (CPSO#: 79786 )
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 498-0368

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ANTHONY MUSSETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ANTHONY MUSSETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003