THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 06:40:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 36
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 332-9292
Fax: (905) 332-9244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Sanjay Dixit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dixit (CPSO#: 79791 )
Business Address: Suite 35
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
(905) 332-9292

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 36
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 332-9292
Fax: (905) 332-9244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Sanjay Dixit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dixit (CPSO#: 79791 )
Business Address: Suite 35
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
(905) 332-9292

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJAY DIXIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXIT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJAY DIXIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXIT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003