THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167661162
Fax: 4167660463

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Drzymala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Drzymala (CPSO#: 79794 )
Business Address: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B6
4167661102 Extn: 101

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Drzymala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Drzymala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167661162
Fax: 4167660463

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Drzymala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Drzymala (CPSO#: 79794 )
Business Address: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B6
4167661102 Extn: 101

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Drzymala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Drzymala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKASZ DRZYMALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRZYMALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKASZ DRZYMALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRZYMALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003