THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peradeniya, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, SINHALA, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 5-2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 299-0710
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact: East York Medical
Health Centre, Suite 27E, 45 Overlea Boulevard, Toronto, ON, M4H 1C3, Tel: 416-696-9836 Ext. 222
Date Received: 12 Jan 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shifaya Cader Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cader (CPSO#: 79816 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, SINHALA, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Peradeniya, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 5-2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 299-0710
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact: East York Medical
Health Centre, Suite 27E, 45 Overlea Boulevard, Toronto, ON, M4H 1C3, Tel: 416-696-9836 Ext. 222
Date Received: 12 Jan 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shifaya Cader Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cader (CPSO#: 79816 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIFAYA CADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CADER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIFAYA CADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CADER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peradeniya, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003