THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:32:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rouge Valley Health Centenary Site
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7103
Fax: (416) 281-7490
Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 4164461575
Fax: 4164462919

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Sep 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Koshy Muthalaly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Muthalaly (CPSO#: 79822 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7103

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rouge Valley Health Centenary Site
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7103
Fax: (416) 281-7490
Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 4164461575
Fax: 4164462919

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Sep 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Koshy Muthalaly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Muthalaly (CPSO#: 79822 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7103

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Oct 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 12 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KOSHY MUTHALALY may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KOSHY MUTHALALY may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kerala, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Oct 2023
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 May 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003