THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:03:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 78571
Fax: (613) 737-8830

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kawan S. Rakhra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rakhra (CPSO#: 79840 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 78571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 78571
Fax: (613) 737-8830

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kawan S. Rakhra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rakhra (CPSO#: 79840 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 78571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAWANPREET SINGH RAKHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAKHRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAWANPREET SINGH RAKHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAKHRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003