THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hanyang University, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230 Victoria St
229b
London ON N6A 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 448-9898
Fax: (519) 245-4787

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hae-Ryun Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Park (CPSO#: 79844 )
Business Address: 230 Victoria St
London ON N6A 2C2
226 448-9898

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: Hanyang University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230 Victoria St
229b
London ON N6A 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 448-9898
Fax: (519) 245-4787

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hae-Ryun Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Park (CPSO#: 79844 )
Business Address: 230 Victoria St
London ON N6A 2C2
226 448-9898

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAE-RYUN PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAE-RYUN PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hanyang University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003