THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:45:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Seoul National University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Suite 1 PMB - 272
585 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: (416) 593-0502

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 27 Nov 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hyun Jung Jang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jang (CPSO#: 79856 )
Business Address: 562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: 918 - 399 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: 585 University Avenue
1 PMB-272
Suite C-546
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: Seoul National University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Suite 1 PMB - 272
585 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: (416) 593-0502

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 27 Nov 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hyun Jung Jang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jang (CPSO#: 79856 )
Business Address: 562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: 918 - 399 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: 585 University Avenue
1 PMB-272
Suite C-546
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HYUN-JUNG JANG may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. JANG holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. JANG may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. JANG no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. JANG no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. JANG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HYUN-JUNG JANG may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. JANG holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. JANG may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. JANG no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. JANG no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. JANG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Seoul National University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003