THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:57:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 34959
Fax: (905) 540-6590
Address: RTM
7111 Syntex Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5N 8C3
Phone: 905 362 0223
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Medbridge Medical Services
34 Eglington Ave, Suite 316
Toronto Ontario M4R 2H6
Phone: 416 993 0187
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2005
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Coret Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Coret (CPSO#: 79859 )
Business Address: Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 34959

Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 34959
Fax: (905) 540-6590
Address: RTM
7111 Syntex Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5N 8C3
Phone: 905 362 0223
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Medbridge Medical Services
34 Eglington Ave, Suite 316
Toronto Ontario M4R 2H6
Phone: 416 993 0187
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2005
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Coret Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Coret (CPSO#: 79859 )
Business Address: Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 34959

Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Feb 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 13 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Alexander Coret may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
radiology.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Alexander Coret may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
radiology.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Feb 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003