THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:34:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of General Surgery
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street Rm 10EN-212
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 5336
Fax: (416) 340-3808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Aug 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol-Anne Moulton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Moulton (CPSO#: 79865 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of General Surgery
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street Rm 10EN-212
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 5336
Fax: (416) 340-3808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Aug 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol-Anne Moulton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Moulton (CPSO#: 79865 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Nov 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 01 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Carole-Anne Evelyn Moulton may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Moulton holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Moulton no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Carole-Anne Evelyn Moulton may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Moulton holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Moulton no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003