THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:26:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 318
2250 Bovaird Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 458-4520
Fax: (905) 458-4080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irshad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Irshad (CPSO#: 79876 )
Business Address: Suite 318
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 458-4520

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 318
2250 Bovaird Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 458-4520
Fax: (905) 458-4080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irshad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Irshad (CPSO#: 79876 )
Business Address: Suite 318
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 458-4520

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KASHIF IRSHAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRSHAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KASHIF IRSHAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRSHAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003