THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:31:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. Amir Rouzati
Unit 34C
100 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 762-9996
Fax: (905) 762-0038

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Rouzati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rouzati (CPSO#: 79892 )
Business Address:

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Rouzati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. Amir Rouzati
Unit 34C
100 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 762-9996
Fax: (905) 762-0038

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Rouzati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rouzati (CPSO#: 79892 )
Business Address:

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Rouzati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIR ROUZATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUZATI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIR ROUZATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUZATI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 03 Aug 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003