THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 06:17:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sahar Al-Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Haddad (CPSO#: 79911 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
6472076237

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sahar Al-Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Haddad (CPSO#: 79911 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
6472076237

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHAR FAIK HAMEED AL-HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HADDAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHAR FAIK HAMEED AL-HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HADDAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2003