THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:17:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fundacao Universidade De Caxias Do Sul, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4687
Fax: (613) 761-4476
Address: 899 W 12th Ave
Vancouver British Columbia V5Z 1M9
Phone: (604)329-4980
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neuroradiology
Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Neurology
Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 Jul 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neuroradiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Dos Santos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dos Santos (CPSO#: 79928 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Medical Imaging Department
1053 Carling Avenue
Room 01-1-10 A
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4687

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Fundacao Universidade De Caxias Do Sul, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4687
Fax: (613) 761-4476
Address: 899 W 12th Ave
Vancouver British Columbia V5Z 1M9
Phone: (604)329-4980
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neuroradiology
Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Neurology
Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 Jul 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neuroradiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Dos Santos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dos Santos (CPSO#: 79928 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Medical Imaging Department
1053 Carling Avenue
Room 01-1-10 A
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4687

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 May 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 01 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARLISE PERUZZO DOS SANTOS may practise medicine independently in neurology and neuroradiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARLISE PERUZZO DOS SANTOS may practise medicine independently in neurology and neuroradiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fundacao Universidade De Caxias Do Sul, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 May 2025
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2025

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 15 May 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 May 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2003