THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:49:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CZECH, SLOVAK, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73495
Fax: (905) 526-0594

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 17 Dec 2007
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2007
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Bercik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bercik (CPSO#: 79956 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CZECH, SLOVAK, SPANISH
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73495
Fax: (905) 526-0594

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 17 Dec 2007
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2007
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Bercik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bercik (CPSO#: 79956 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Feb 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 05 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Premysl Bercik may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Gastroenterology, McMaster University, in which Dr.
Bercik holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bercik no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in cluase 1.





VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Premysl Bercik may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Gastroenterology, McMaster University, in which Dr.
Bercik holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bercik no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in cluase 1.





Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2003