THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:11:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Strickland St. Unit 1
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 652-6405
Fax: (705) 652-6406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey D. Boyes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boyes (CPSO#: 79959 )
Business Address: 150 Strickland Street
Douro-Dummer Ontario K0L 2H0
(705) 652-6405

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Strickland St. Unit 1
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 652-6405
Fax: (705) 652-6406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey D. Boyes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boyes (CPSO#: 79959 )
Business Address: 150 Strickland Street
Douro-Dummer Ontario K0L 2H0
(705) 652-6405

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY DOUGLAS BOYES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY DOUGLAS BOYES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2003