THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:10:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue,
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1390 Don Mills Road
Canadian Dermatology Centre
Unit D101
Toronto Ontario M3B 3N1
Phone: 416-244-8377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Virat Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Joshi (CPSO#: 79972 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 45 Wyndham Street North
Suite B2
Guelph Ontario N1H 4E4
(519) 822-3102
Business Address: 298 John Street
Unit 3
Thornhill Ontario L3T 5W4
(905) 482-8648
Business Address: 5460 Yonge Street
Unit 204
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
(416) 250-7171
Business Address: 2145 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1K2
Business Address: 2-1450 Centre St
Thornhill ON L4J 3N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue,
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1390 Don Mills Road
Canadian Dermatology Centre
Unit D101
Toronto Ontario M3B 3N1
Phone: 416-244-8377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Virat Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Joshi (CPSO#: 79972 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 45 Wyndham Street North
Suite B2
Guelph Ontario N1H 4E4
(519) 822-3102
Business Address: 298 John Street
Unit 3
Thornhill Ontario L3T 5W4
(905) 482-8648
Business Address: 5460 Yonge Street
Unit 204
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
(416) 250-7171
Business Address: 2145 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1K2
Business Address: 2-1450 Centre St
Thornhill ON L4J 3N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIRAT JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIRAT JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On July 7, 2015, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Virat Joshi in respect of an incident that took place in February 2006.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On July 7, 2015, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Virat Joshi in respect of an incident that took place in February 2006.

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2003