THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:15:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Izevsk State Medical Academy, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46698
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1144 Wilson St W #205
Ancaster Ontario L9G3K9
Phone: 905-929-9295
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3155 Harvester Rd #207
Burlington Ontario L7N3V2
Phone: 905-929-9296
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 726 Upper James St
Hamilton Ontario L9C2Z9
Phone: 905-929-9296
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrei Gagarine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gagarine (CPSO#: 79990 )
Business Address: 15 Sun Ave
Dundas ON L9H 5A6
905-929-9296

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrei Gagarine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Izevsk State Medical Academy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46698
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1144 Wilson St W #205
Ancaster Ontario L9G3K9
Phone: 905-929-9295
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3155 Harvester Rd #207
Burlington Ontario L7N3V2
Phone: 905-929-9296
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 726 Upper James St
Hamilton Ontario L9C2Z9
Phone: 905-929-9296
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrei Gagarine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gagarine (CPSO#: 79990 )
Business Address: 15 Sun Ave
Dundas ON L9H 5A6
905-929-9296

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrei Gagarine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREI EVGENIEVICH GAGARINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGARINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREI EVGENIEVICH GAGARINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGARINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Izevsk State Medical Academy, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2003