THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:58:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108 - 3050 Confederation Pkwy
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-306-7885
Fax: 905-306-7895
Address: F001B - 6045 Creditview Rd
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2A8
Phone: 905-826-6095
Fax: 905-826-9219

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.N.ATTIA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Attia (CPSO#: 79994 )
Business Address: 3050 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3Z6

Corporation Name: A. N. Attia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108 - 3050 Confederation Pkwy
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-306-7885
Fax: 905-306-7895
Address: F001B - 6045 Creditview Rd
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2A8
Phone: 905-826-6095
Fax: 905-826-9219

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.N.ATTIA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Attia (CPSO#: 79994 )
Business Address: 3050 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3Z6

Corporation Name: A. N. Attia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMINE NAGUIB ATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMINE NAGUIB ATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 16 Jul 2009
Summary of Decision:
On July 16, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Attia committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional.

Dr. Attia obtained his medical degree in Egypt in 1979. Between 1980 and 1995, Dr. Attia practiced medicine in Egypt and Saudi Arabia. He immigrated to Canada in 1995. Between 2001 and 2003, Dr. Attia practiced medicine in Newfoundland. He submitted an application to the CPSO in 2003. On the application, he inaccurately stated that he practised as a general practitioner in Egypt from 1980 to 2001. In fact, he did not practice medicine continuously in any jurisdiction between 1995 and 2001. Dr. Attia maintains that he returned to Cairo for periods in 1996, 1998 and 2001, at which time he states that he attended patients. Dr. Attia failed to account for this break in his practice history on his application, and also failed to disclose his period of practice in Saudi Arabia.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Attia successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course on the next available date, and in any event within six months of the date of the Order, and to provide proof thereof to the College.

2. Dr. Attia appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. Attia pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of the Order.

4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 16, 2009

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Jul 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 16 Jul 2009
Summary of Decision:
On July 16, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Attia committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional.

Dr. Attia obtained his medical degree in Egypt in 1979. Between 1980 and 1995, Dr. Attia practiced medicine in Egypt and Saudi Arabia. He immigrated to Canada in 1995. Between 2001 and 2003, Dr. Attia practiced medicine in Newfoundland. He submitted an application to the CPSO in 2003. On the application, he inaccurately stated that he practised as a general practitioner in Egypt from 1980 to 2001. In fact, he did not practice medicine continuously in any jurisdiction between 1995 and 2001. Dr. Attia maintains that he returned to Cairo for periods in 1996, 1998 and 2001, at which time he states that he attended patients. Dr. Attia failed to account for this break in his practice history on his application, and also failed to disclose his period of practice in Saudi Arabia.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Attia successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course on the next available date, and in any event within six months of the date of the Order, and to provide proof thereof to the College.

2. Dr. Attia appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. Attia pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of the Order.

4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 16, 2009

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Jul 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 25 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 23 May 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2003